OK HB3160 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and Taxation; sales tax exemptions; University Hospitals Trust; effective date.
Title
Revenue and Taxation; sales tax exemptions; University Hospitals Trust; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 16 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Emergency removed |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-17 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Martinez |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |