OK HB3157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; deleting the power of municipalities to regulate the carrying of firearms; powers of the Governor during a state of emergency; effective date.
Title
Firearms; deleting the power of municipalities to regulate the carrying of firearms; powers of the Governor during a state of emergency; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Jim Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 17 |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, McDugle |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen, Roberts (Sean) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2022-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |