OK HB3152 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Vetoed 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Vetoed 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to the annual salaries of employees of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; chief executive officer salaries; clarifying reference; effective date.
Title
State government; relating to the annual salaries of employees of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; chief executive officer salaries; clarifying reference; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Vetoed 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-24 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-05-23 | First Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-23 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-23 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-23 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears | |
2012-05-23 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 25 | |
2012-05-23 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears | |
2012-05-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4 | |
2012-05-23 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-23 | General Order | |
2012-05-21 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-21 | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-05-16 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-05-15 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Justice | |
2012-05-15 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-05-15 | Authored by Representative Sears, Martin (Scott) | |
2012-05-15 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 150 | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3601 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |