OK HB3151 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommunications; imposing maximum charges with respect to certain connections to utility poles; rate increases; electrical power and services; effective date.
Title
Telecommunications; imposing maximum charges with respect to certain connections to utility poles; rate increases; electrical power and services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 18 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2020-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Martinez |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |