OK HB3147 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Placed on General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Placed on General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign finance and financial disclosure; modifying definitions; authorizing Ethics Commission to develop certain online reporting processes; effective date.
Title
Campaign finance and financial disclosure; modifying definitions; authorizing Ethics Commission to develop certain online reporting processes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4 |
2022-03-21 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-21 | House | Amended |
2022-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2022-03-21 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |