OK HB3142 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; licensure and certification; modifying certification requirements for school principals; effective date.
Title
Schools; licensure and certification; modifying certification requirements for school principals; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] | Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] | Rep. Kelly Albright [D] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Albright, Davis |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2020-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Provenzano |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |