OK HB3137 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Poor persons; relating to the powers and duties of the Commission for Human Services; creating certain Advisory Panels; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Poor persons; relating to the powers and duties of the Commission for Human Services; creating certain Advisory Panels; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Health: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/31/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-25 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-24 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-24 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2012-05-24 coauthored by Brinkley
2012-05-24 CCR adopted
2012-05-22 CCR read
2012-05-22 To Senate
2012-05-22 Motion to reconsider tabled
2012-05-22 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson
2012-05-22 Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 23
2012-05-22 CCR adopted
2012-05-21 Enacting clause restored
2012-05-21 Title restored
2012-05-21 CCR submitted
2012-05-08 Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Johnson (Rob), Crain, Bingman, Burrage, Ballenger
2012-05-02 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Health and Human Services
2012-04-24 SA's received
2012-04-24 Engrossed to House
2012-04-23 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-23 Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
2012-04-23 General Order, Considered
2012-04-09 Enacting clause stricken
2012-04-09 Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2012-03-21 Second Reading referred to Rules
2012-03-14 First Reading
2012-03-14 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-13 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 18
2012-03-13 Title stricken
2012-03-13 Amended
2012-03-13 Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson
2012-03-13 General Order
2012-02-28 Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2012-02-28 Coauthored by Representative(s) Rousselot, Nelson, Ownbey
2012-02-28 Remove Representative Nelson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Steele
2012-02-28 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee
2012-02-23 Referred to Human Services Committee
2012-02-23 Withdrawn from Rules Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Rules
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Nelson
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
561621aNew CodeSee Bill Text
561621bAmended CodeSee Bill Text
741297New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback