OK HB3135 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Juveniles; sexually abused children; authorizing courts to depart from certain sentencing requirements; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles; sexually abused children; authorizing courts to depart from certain sentencing requirements; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Brewer
2020-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2020-03-09HouseTitle stricken
2020-03-09HouseAmended
2020-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Young (principal Senate author)
2020-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Virgin
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback