OK HB3131 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Franchise Tax Code; levy of tax after certain year; annual statement requirement; effective date.
Title
Franchise Tax Code; levy of tax after certain year; annual statement requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13 |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Kendrix |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |