OK HB3129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; expanding certain county operation procedure requirements to road and bridge construction services; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; expanding certain county operation procedure requirements to road and bridge construction services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 9 |
2018-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-13 | House | Remove Representative Murdock as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2018-03-13 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) |
2018-03-13 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Murdock |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |