OK HB3123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; access to advanced manufacturing and digital fabrication tools; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; access to advanced manufacturing and digital fabrication tools; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-03 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 25 |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2018-05-01 | House | Title restored |
2018-05-01 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2018-04-18 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2018-04-17 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 13 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 33 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Blancett |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |