OK HB3120 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Indigent defense; duties of the office of the county indigent defender; presumption; eligibility; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indigent defense; duties of the office of the county indigent defender; presumption; eligibility; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13
2018-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2018-03-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Osborn (Leslie), Dunnington
2018-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Blancett
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
191385New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback