OK HB3116 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; Successful Adulthood Act; effective date.
Title
Children; Successful Adulthood Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Branham |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |