OK HB3111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; creating the Oklahoma Tourism Ignition Program; effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Oklahoma Tourism Ignition Program; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |