OK HB3108 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-33)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Designating various memorial highways and bridges; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating various memorial highways and bridges; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors

Sen. Patrick Anderson [R]Rep. Don Armes [R]Rep. Gary Banz [R]Rep. John Bennett [R]
Rep. Lisa Billy [R]Rep. Gus Blackwell [R]Rep. Mike Brown [D]Rep. David Brumbaugh [R]
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Rep. Mike Christian [R]Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]
Rep. Donnie Condit [D]Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Marian Cooksey [R]Rep. Doug Cox [R]
Rep. David Dank [R]Rep. Lee Denney [R]Rep. David Derby [R]Rep. Dale DeWitt [R]
Rep. Joe Dorman [D]Rep. John Enns [R]Rep. Rusty Farley [R]Rep. George Faught [R]
Rep. William Fourkiller [D]Rep. Larry Glenn [D]Rep. Randon Grau [R]Rep. Elise Hall [R]
Rep. Rebecca Hamilton [D]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R]Rep. Wes Hilliard [D]
Rep. Corey Holland [R]Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]Rep. Scott Inman [D]Rep. Michael Jackson [R]
Sen. Rob Johnson [R]Rep. Fred Jordan [R]Rep. Charles Joyner [R]Rep. Sally Kern [R]
Rep. Charles Key [R]Rep. Dan Kirby [R]Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]Rep. Guy Liebmann [R]
Rep. James Lockhart [D]Rep. Scott Martin [R]Rep. Steve Martin [R]Sen. Al McAffrey [D]
Rep. Mark McCullough [R]Rep. Curtis McDaniel [D]Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D]Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]
Sen. Judy McIntyre [D]Rep. Skye McNiel [R]Rep. Jerry McPeak [D]Rep. Lewis Moore [R]
Rep. Danny Morgan [D]Rep. Richard Morrissette [D]Rep. Glen Mulready [R]Rep. Jason Murphey [R]
Rep. Jason Nelson [R]Rep. Tom Newell [R]Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]Rep. Ron Peters [R]Rep. Pam Peterson [R]
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]Rep. Eric Proctor [D]Rep. Raymond Pruett [D]Sen. Marty Quinn [R]
Rep. Brian Renegar [D]Rep. Mike Reynolds [R]Rep. Phil Richardson [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]
Rep. Paul Roan [D]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Wade Rousselot [D]
Rep. Todd Russ [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Rep. Michael Schwartz [R]Rep. Seneca Scott [D]
Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R]Rep. Mike Shelton [D]Rep. Ben Sherrer [D]
Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D]Sen. Jabar Shumate [D]Rep. Kris Steele [R]Rep. Aaron Stiles [R]
Rep. Randy Terrill [R]Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Rep. Sue Tibbs [R]Rep. John Trebilcock [R]
Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]Rep. Emily Virgin [D]Rep. Purcy Walker [D]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]
Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R]Rep. Cory Williams [D]Rep. Harold Wright [R]

Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Conference Committee on General Government: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-25 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-25 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-25 coauthored by Eason McIntyre
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-23 CCR read
2012-05-23 To Senate
2012-05-23 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2012-05-23 Coauthored by all other Representatives
2012-05-23 CCR adopted
2012-05-22 Title restored
2012-05-22 CCR submitted
2012-05-07 Conference granted, SCs named Anderson, Stanislawski, Newberry, Allen, Paddack, Burrage
2012-04-24 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on General Government and Transportation
2012-04-16 SA's received
2012-04-16 Engrossed to House
2012-04-12 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-12 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2012-04-12 Title stricken
2012-04-12 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2012-04-04 coauthored by Martin (Scott)
2012-04-04 Title stricken
2012-04-04 Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to Transportation
2012-03-12 First Reading
2012-03-12 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-08 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 2
2012-03-08 Amended
2012-03-08 Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker
2012-03-08 General Order
2012-02-15 Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
2012-02-15 Coauthored by Representative(s) Vaughan
2012-02-15 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Transportation
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Hickman
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
691698112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698119Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698134Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
691698136Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback