OK HB3098 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; State Architectural and Registered Interior Designers Act; modifying various references to name of act; recreating Board; effective date; emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; State Architectural and Registered Interior Designers Act; modifying various references to name of act; recreating Board; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 15 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |