OK HB3091 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal record expungements; providing access to expunged records for certain purposes; effective date.
Title
Criminal record expungements; providing access to expunged records for certain purposes; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Cory Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | |
2012-04-25 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Denney, Sherrer | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 14 | |
2012-03-15 | Remove Senator Lerblance as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Johnson (Rob) | |
2012-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Hoskin | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-21 | Authored by Senator Lerblance (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-21 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Williams | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |