OK HB3088 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and Taxation; income tax credit; adoption expense; effective date.
Title
Revenue and Taxation; income tax credit; adoption expense; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] |
Rep. Eric Roberts [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2022-05-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Eric) |
2022-05-19 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Phillips |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |