OK HB3086 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Juvenile Affairs; designating certain employees hired after specified date as unclassified; effective date.
Title
Office of Juvenile Affairs; designating certain employees hired after specified date as unclassified; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/07/2018 |
2018-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 17 |
2018-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 9 |
2018-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-05 | House | General Order |
2018-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 2 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |