OK HB3076 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; national criminal history check for prospective volunteers; effective date.
Title
Schools; national criminal history check for prospective volunteers; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 34 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 34 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Motion expired | |
2012-04-18 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Johnson (Rob) | |
2012-04-18 | Measure failed: Ayes: 13 Nays: 27 | |
2012-04-18 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-18 | Title restored | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | Withdrawn from Education committee | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 3 | |
2012-03-15 | Amended | |
2012-03-15 | House Rule suspended | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |