OK HB3073 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; reducing time limitation for reporting requirement, hearing continuances and deferral periods; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; reducing time limitation for reporting requirement, hearing continuances and deferral periods; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Motion expired |
2018-03-13 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Worthen |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 51 |
2018-03-13 | House | Amended |
2018-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-13 | House | General Order |
2018-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |