OK HB3061 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Remove as coauthor Senator Gumm
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Remove as coauthor Senator Gumm
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Waters and water rights; creating the Water Infrastructure Revolving Account; making the account a permanent and perpetual account; stating source of funding. Effective date.
Title
Waters and water rights; creating the Water Infrastructure Revolving Account; making the account a permanent and perpetual account; stating source of funding. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] |
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Charles Ortega [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Remove as coauthor Senator Gumm | |
2010-05-26 | Considered and deferred | |
2010-05-24 | CCR read | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21; Ayes: 61 Nays: 25 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | Title restored | |
2010-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-19 | SCs named Justice, Bingman, Schulz, Marlatt, Gumm | |
2010-05-19 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2010-04-28 | HC's named: DeWitt, Walker, Roan, Shoemake, Fields, Ortega, Schwartz | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-21 | SA's received | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 | |
2010-04-20 | coauthored by Gumm | |
2010-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Ortega | |
2010-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-24 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services | |
2010-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Ortega | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-09 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Emergency added | |
2010-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fields, Denney | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative DeWitt | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 1020 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 1085 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |