OK HB3055 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Security fences; definitions; battery-charged security fence; municipal or county ordinances; emergency.
Title
Security fences; definitions; battery-charged security fence; municipal or county ordinances; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-15 | House | General Order |
2022-03-01 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2022-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Sims |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |