OK HB3054 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Information Technology Consolidation and Coordination Act; modifying definitions; exempting certain agencies from consolidation; effective date.
Title
Public finance; Information Technology Consolidation and Coordination Act; modifying definitions; exempting certain agencies from consolidation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 34 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |