OK HB3053 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; providing option for sentences to be deferred when offenders successfully complete drug court programs; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; providing option for sentences to be deferred when offenders successfully complete drug court programs; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] |
Rep. Eric Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-10 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2022-05-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2022-05-10 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Eric) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Phillips |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-07 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Boles |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |