OK HB3052 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Corrections; modifying eligibility requirements for earned credits; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections; modifying eligibility requirements for earned credits; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: ADOPT (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-09 Approved by Governor 05/09/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-03 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-02 Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 18
2012-05-02 Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Tibbs, Hickman
2012-05-02 SA's read, adopted
2012-04-30 SA's received
2012-04-30 Engrossed to House
2012-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
2012-04-25 General Order, Considered
2012-04-09 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2012-03-26 Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2012-03-12 First Reading
2012-03-12 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-08 Motion expired
2012-03-06 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Steele
2012-03-06 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 27
2012-03-06 Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney, McCullough, Scott, Walker, Cooksey, McDaniel (Jeannie)
2012-03-06 General Order
2012-02-29 Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author)
2012-02-29 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Billy
2012-02-29 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Steele
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21131New CodeSee Bill Text
224712New CodeSee Bill Text
22991a21Amended CodeSee Bill Text
575171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
632402New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback