OK HB3046 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Officers; declaring certain policies to substantially burden a person's free exercise of religion; effective date.
Title
Officers; declaring certain policies to substantially burden a person's free exercise of religion; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Kidd |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dunnington, Pae, Branham, Phillips |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Rosecrants, Ranson, Albright |
2020-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |