OK HB3040 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Open records; personnel information; exempting certain personal information of public employees from mandatory disclosure; effective date.
Title
Open records; personnel information; exempting certain personal information of public employees from mandatory disclosure; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fugate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Virgin, Provenzano, Dills, Ranson, Davis, Rosecrants |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn, May, Mize |
2020-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |