OK HB3038 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - SCs named Jolley, Bingman, Schulz, Johnson (Rob), Wilson, Burrage
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - SCs named Jolley, Bingman, Schulz, Johnson (Rob), Wilson, Burrage
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; individual income tax; rates; reductions; deductions and exemptions; tax credits; sales tax revenue apportionment; effective dates.
Title
Revenue and taxation; individual income tax; rates; reductions; deductions and exemptions; tax credits; sales tax revenue apportionment; effective dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 50 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 50 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | SCs named Jolley, Bingman, Schulz, Johnson (Rob), Wilson, Burrage | |
2012-05-23 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-18 | SA's received | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-17 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 | |
2012-04-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Holt, Treat | |
2012-04-09 | Emergency added | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-14 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Osborn | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 35 | |
2012-03-14 | Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Remove as author Representative(s) Denney, Cooksey | |
2012-03-14 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Johnson, Liebmann, Moore, McCullough, Richardson, Kern, Wesselhoft, Reynolds | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Osborn, Newell, Derby, Murphey, Brumbaugh, Blackwell, Hall, McDaniel (Randy), Holland, Cockroft, Faught, Tibbs, Cooksey, Grau, Vaughan, Ortega, Kirby, Jackson, Armes, Denney, Sanders, Wright, Mulready | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2355 | 1A | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2355 | 1E | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 102 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 203 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 29 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 304 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 43 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | 1A | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | 1B | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | 5A | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 5358 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |