OK HB3023 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Remove Representative Worthen as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hasenbeck
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Remove Representative Worthen as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hasenbeck
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Dental insurance claims; definitions; requirements; effective date.
Title
Dental insurance claims; definitions; requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Remove Representative Worthen as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hasenbeck |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |