OK HB3017 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; inmates in need of psychiatric care; deleting requirement for certain entity to provide a psychiatrist; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; inmates in need of psychiatric care; deleting requirement for certain entity to provide a psychiatrist; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5 |
2020-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative CrosswhiteHader |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |