OK HB3016 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; adjustments to taxable income; health care sharing ministry benefits; definition; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; adjustments to taxable income; health care sharing ministry benefits; definition; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Faught
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback