OK HB3015 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tourism; tourism information centers; adult-sized changing tables; effective date.
Title
Tourism; tourism information centers; adult-sized changing tables; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 9 |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boatman |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Dollens |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |