OK HB3011 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; creating the Sales Tax Simplification and Fairness Reform Act of 2020; sales tax refunds and reporting; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; creating the Sales Tax Simplification and Fairness Reform Act of 2020; sales tax refunds and reporting; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-02-12HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Gann
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback