OK HB3009 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; expanding scope of crime; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; expanding scope of crime; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Donnie Condit [D] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Rep. Randy Terrill [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Approved by Governor 04/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-17 | Title restored | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by McAffrey | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Condit | |
2012-03-12 | General Order | |
2012-02-14 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Terrill | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |