OK HB3000 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; expanding prohibition from school board reelection for failure to complete continuing education requirements; emergency.
Title
Schools; expanding prohibition from school board reelection for failure to complete continuing education requirements; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 58 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 58 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Approved by Governor 05/07/2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-30 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 12 | |
2012-04-30 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-24 | SA's received | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-23 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-23 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2012-02-29 | First Reading | |
2012-02-29 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9 | |
2012-02-28 | Amended | |
2012-02-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson | |
2012-02-28 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Newell | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |