OK HB3000 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
The Governmental Tort Claims Act; relating to settlements; authorizing certain structured settlements; relating to the Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; expanding excluded acquisitions. Effective date.
Title
The Governmental Tort Claims Act; relating to settlements; authorizing certain structured settlements; relating to the Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; expanding excluded acquisitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-27 | Title restored | |
2010-05-27 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Steele, Sullivan, Jordan, Sherrer, Inman | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-29 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-26 | SA's received | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-21 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Jett | |
2010-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Jett | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Laster (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 158 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 85 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |