OK HB2998 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Counties; circuit engineering districts; statewide procedure to protect county infrastructure in certain circumstances; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; circuit engineering districts; statewide procedure to protect county infrastructure in certain circumstances; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2018-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 7
2018-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Vaughan
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
696871New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback