OK HB2998 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties; circuit engineering districts; statewide procedure to protect county infrastructure in certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Counties; circuit engineering districts; statewide procedure to protect county infrastructure in certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2018-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-05 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Vaughan |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |