OK HB2992 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; child witness statements; testimony; age requirements; definition; statutory references; effective date.
Title
Children; child witness statements; testimony; age requirements; definition; statutory references; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Trish Ranson [D] | Rep. John Talley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-27 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Talley |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ranson |
2022-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4 |
2022-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Floyd (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-21 | House | General Order |
2022-02-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |