OK HB2985 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Motion to suspend rule failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Motion to suspend rule failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; cost-of-living adjustments; Firefighters Pension and Retirement System; Police Pension and Retirement System; Uniform Retirement System for Justices and Judges; Law Enforcement Retirement System; Teachers’ Retirement System; Public Employees Retirement System; effective dates.
Title
Public retirement systems; Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; cost-of-living adjustments; Firefighters Pension and Retirement System; Police Pension and Retirement System; Uniform Retirement System for Justices and Judges; Law Enforcement Retirement System; Teachers’ Retirement System; Public Employees Retirement System; effective dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-19 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-17 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-03 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-03-05 | House | Withdrawn from Calendar; referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Frix |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 49 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 50 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 930 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |