OK HB2981 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Holidays; designating the 12th of June of each year as Oklahoma Military Women in History Day; emergency.
Title
Holidays; designating the 12th of June of each year as Oklahoma Military Women in History Day; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Albright [D] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] | Rep. Denise Brewer [D] | Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] |
Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] |
Rep. Jay Steagall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley |
2020-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Brewer |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Emergency added |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall, Stark |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller, Pae, Fugate |
2020-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Albright |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |