OK HB2980 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; authorizing school counseling services be provided by school counselors; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; authorizing school counseling services be provided by school counselors; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Albright
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback