OK HB2978 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax credits; criteria; restrictions; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credits; criteria; restrictions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-05-01 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-24 | SA's received | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Emergency removed | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Dank | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |