OK HB2976 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; list of registered voters; providing exception for sharing of information; effective date.
Title
Elections; list of registered voters; providing exception for sharing of information; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-27 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 10 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 17 |
2022-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2022-03-14 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Olsen |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |