OK HB2974 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; providing for query of voter registration database; requiring certain notification; requiring investigation; providing exceptions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; providing for query of voter registration database; requiring certain notification; requiring investigation; providing exceptions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-09HouseApproved by Governor 05/09/2022
2022-05-05HouseSent to Governor
2022-05-05SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2022-05-05HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2022-05-04HouseReferred for enrollment
2022-05-04HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 10
2022-05-04HouseSA's read, adopted
2022-04-27HouseSA's received
2022-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2022-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2022-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
2022-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2022-03-30SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2022-03-30SenateTitle restored
2022-03-30SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2022-03-24SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2022-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2022-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2022-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2022-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 23
2022-03-08HouseTitle stricken
2022-03-08HouseAmended
2022-03-08HouseAuthored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
2022-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2022-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
2022-02-08HouseSecond Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
2022-02-07HouseAuthored by Representative Olsen
2022-02-07HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2974&Session=2200
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2974%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2974%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2974%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2974%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2974%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB2974%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2974%20FA1%20WALLACEKE-CC.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2974%20CA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2974%20(4-05-22)%20(BERGSTROM)%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2974%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2974%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2974_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2974_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback