OK HB2974 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporation Commission; making not-for-profit mental health and substance abuse facilities eligible to receive certain special universal services; effective date.
Title
Corporation Commission; making not-for-profit mental health and substance abuse facilities eligible to receive certain special universal services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Loveless |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 28 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Griffin; authored by Loveless |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Schwartz |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 139 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 139 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |