OK HB2972 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Jurors; jury service; medical exemption; authorizing physician assistant and advanced practice registered nurse to verify medical exemption; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jurors; jury service; medical exemption; authorizing physician assistant and advanced practice registered nurse to verify medical exemption; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-29SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2022-03-24SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2022-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2022-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2022-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2022-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 18
2022-03-14HouseAmended
2022-03-14HouseHouse Rule suspended
2022-03-14HouseMotion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19
2022-03-10HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative West (Rick)
2022-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 59
2022-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2022-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Burns (principal Senate author)
2022-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
2022-02-08HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
2022-02-07HouseAuthored by Representative West (Rick)
2022-02-07HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2972&Session=2200
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2972%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2972%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2972%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2972%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2972%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2972%20FULLAMD1%20CHRIS%20KANNADY-MAH.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2972%20FA1%20KANNADYCH-MAH(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2972%20FULLAMD1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2972%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2972%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2972_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2972_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback