OK HB2971 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; creating the Child Welfare Review Committee for the Death and Near Death of Children With Disabilities; effective date; emergency.
Title
Children; creating the Child Welfare Review Committee for the Death and Near Death of Children With Disabilities; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Nollan |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-01 | House | General Order |
2016-02-16 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2016-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |