OK HB2970 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; modifying purpose of the Viticulture and Enology Center Development Revolving Fund; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; modifying purpose of the Viticulture and Enology Center Development Revolving Fund; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2020-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
2020-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
2020-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2020-02-13HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative West (Josh)
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback